WI AB574 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - Published 2-5-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - Published 2-5-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.396 (3) (b) 1., 48.396 (3) (c) 1r., 938.396 (2m) (b) 1. and 938.396 (2m) (c) 1r. of the statutes; Relating to: the disclosure of electronic juvenile court records to a county department of human services or social services for purposes of providing intake and depositional services. (FE)
Title
The disclosure of electronic juvenile court records to a county department of human services or social services for purposes of providing intake and depositional services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Published 2-5-2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 144 |
2016-02-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-3-2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | LRB correction |
2016-01-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-01-19 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-19 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-19 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-19 | House | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-01-14 | House | Placed on calendar 1-19-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-01-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-07 | House | Representative Johnson added as a coauthor |
2016-01-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2015-12-07 | House | Introduced |