WI AB574 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 91.84 (1) (c); and to amend 91.84 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: designation of agricultural enterprise areas. (FE)
Title
Designation of agricultural enterprise areas. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 3 |
2014-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Agriculture |
2013-12-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab574 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB574.pdf |