WI AB573 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 196.504 (2m) and 196.504 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: broadband mapping and the use of certain federal funds for wireless broadband and cellular service expansion grants. (FE)
Title
Broadband mapping and the use of certain federal funds for wireless broadband and cellular service expansion grants. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2022-03-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2021-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced |