WI AB571 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 5.84 (1) and 7.315 (2); to renumber and amend 6.50 (3); to amend 5.056, 5.40 (7), 7.08 (1) (a), 7.08 (1) (c), 7.15 (1m), 85.61 (1) and 301.03 (20m); and to create 5.057, 5.058, 5.84 (1) (b), 5.84 (4), 6.36 (1) (ae) 3., 6.50 (3) (b) and (c), 6.50 (4m), 7.15 (16), 7.23 (1) (jm), 7.315 (2) (b) and 69.03 (16) of the statutes; Relating to: maintenance of the voter registration list, training of municipal clerks, data sharing agreements, pre-election procedures, lines at the polls on election day, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maintenance of the voter registration list, training of municipal clerks, data sharing agreements, pre-election procedures, lines at the polls on election day, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2023-11-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2023-11-10SenateReceived from Assembly
2023-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2023-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed
2023-11-09HouseRules suspended
2023-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2023-11-09HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2023-11-09HouseRead a second time
2023-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
2023-11-07HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2023-11-07HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
2023-11-07HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2023-11-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-11-07HouseExecutive action taken
2023-11-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-11-02HousePublic hearing held
2023-10-31HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Maxey
2023-10-26HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2023-10-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback