WI AB571 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 146.905 (1); to amend 146.905 (2); and to create 146.905 (1g) and 146.905 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing discounts for prompt payment of health care fees.
Title
Allowing discounts for prompt payment of health care fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-28 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-09-24 | House | Representatives Billings and Shelton added as coauthors |
2021-09-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced |