WI AB57 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.14 (4) (intro.), 961.14 (4) (x), 961.14 (7) (intro.), 961.41 (1) (e) (intro.), 961.41 (1m) (e) (intro.) and 961.41 (3g) (d); and to create 59.54 (25g), 66.0107 (1) (bn), 961.14 (4) (tb), 961.14 (4) (te), 961.14 (4) (th), 961.14 (4) (tL), 961.14 (4) (tp), 961.14 (4) (tr), 961.14 (4) (tu), 961.14 (4) (ty), 961.14 (4) (wgm), 961.14 (7) (m), 961.14 (7) (n) and 961.41 (3g) (em) of the statutes; relating to: certain controlled substances and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Certain controlled substances and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-02 | House | Placed on calendar 6-8-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-05-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-05-25 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2011-05-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-05-05 | House | Senator Kedzie added as a cosponsor |
2011-04-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-03-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-24 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2011-03-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-03-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab57 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB57.pdf |