WI AB569 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 102.42 (1); and to create 102.17 (9), 102.42 (1p) and 102.44 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: claims for compensation for post-traumatic stress disorder by police officers and fire fighters under the worker's compensation law. (FE)
Title
Claims for compensation for post-traumatic stress disorder by police officers and fire fighters under the worker's compensation law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2020-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Emerson |
2020-01-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Emerson |
2020-01-16 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2020-01-16 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-15 | House | Senators Carpenter and Testin added as cosponsors |
2020-01-15 | House | Representatives Ohnstad, Plumer, Sargent, Billings, Thiesfeldt, Rohrkaste, Zamarripa and Loudenbeck added as coauthors |
2020-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-17 | House | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-04 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2019-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-10-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab569 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB569.pdf |