WI AB569 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.385 (1m); and to amend 115.28 (10m) (a) (intro.), 115.28 (10m) (b), 115.28 (10o) (a) and 115.385 (1) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: publication of school and school district accountability reports.
Title
Publication of school and school district accountability reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:09 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-10-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab569 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB569.pdf |