WI AB568 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (11m) (a) (intro.) and 36.11 (11m) (b); and to create 36.11 (11m) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: investment of certain University of Wisconsin System revenues. (FE)
Title
Investment of certain University of Wisconsin System revenues. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2022-01-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-06 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-10-28 | House | Representative Duchow added as a coauthor |
2021-10-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced |