WI AB565 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.54 (2) (a) 3., 100.54 (4) (a) 4., 100.54 (6) (a) 3., 100.54 (9) (b), 100.545 (3) (a) 4., 100.545 (4) (a) 3., 100.545 (5) (b) and 100.545 (5) (c); to renumber and amend 100.54 (9) (a) and 100.545 (5) (a); and to amend 100.54 (2) (b) (intro.), 100.54 (4) (b), 100.54 (6) (b), 100.54 (9) (title), 100.54 (11) and 100.545 (5) (title) of the statutes; Relating to: fees related to security freezes on consumer credit reports.
Title
Fees related to security freezes on consumer credit reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Representatives Barca and Meyers added as coauthors |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-08 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2017-12-21 | House | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor |
2017-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-22 | House | Representative Zimmerman added as a coauthor |
2017-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab565 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB565.pdf |