WI AB562 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 85.062 (3) (b); to renumber and amend 85.066 (3); and to create 85.066 (3) (a) to (c) and 85.20 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: expenditures relating to the operation of a rail fixed guideway transportation system in a first class city.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expenditures relating to the operation of a rail fixed guideway transportation system in a first class city.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2016-02-23SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2016-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2016-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2016-02-18HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 36, Paired 2
2016-02-18HouseRules suspended
2016-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2016-02-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2016-02-18HouseRead a second time
2016-02-16HouseMade a special order of business at 1:18 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
2016-02-12HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2016-02-12HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 5
2016-02-12HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2016-02-11HouseExecutive action taken
2016-01-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kremer and Sanfelippo
2015-12-08HousePublic hearing held
2015-12-04HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2015-12-04HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback