WI AB562 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1002 of the statutes; relating to: limiting the authority of a city, village, or town to enact a development moratorium ordinance. (FE)
Title
Limiting the authority of a city, village, or town to enact a development moratorium ordinance. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Housing, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2012-03-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Housing, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2012-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-03-02 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2012-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Housing |
2012-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab562 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB562.pdf |