WI AB561 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: affecting various provisions of the statutes to correct errors and reconcile conflicts (Corrections Bill).
Title
Affecting various provisions of the statutes to correct errors and reconcile conflicts (Corrections Bill).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Published 3-28-2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 165 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-01-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-01-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-01-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2014-01-14 | House | Read a second time |
2014-01-08 | House | Placed on calendar 1-14-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-12-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced |