WI AB56 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Published 6-24-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Published 6-24-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 100.18 (6); and to amend 98.03 (2) and 100.18 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: advertising motor fuel prices by the half-gallon.
Title
Advertising motor fuel prices by the half-gallon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Published 6-24-2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 6-23-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 22 |
2017-06-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-21-2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-21-2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | LRB correction |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-03-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced |