WI AB56 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.11 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin System reports regarding remedial courses in English and mathematics.
Title
University of Wisconsin System reports regarding remedial courses in English and mathematics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 28 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-29-2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Education Reform and Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 2) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education Reform and Government Operations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | House | Representatives Allen, Heaton, Rohrkaste, Czaja, Thiesfeldt, Skowronski, Kremer, Edming, Rodriguez, Kulp, Brandtjen, Mursau, Gannon, J. Ott, Nygren, Jacque and Kitchens added as coauthors |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Jagler |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 37 |
2015-03-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Billings, Hesselbein, Genrich, Pope, Hebl, Berceau, Kolste, Stuck, Brostoff, Bowen, Johnson, Barnes, Doyle, Wachs and Shankland |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 3-17-2015 |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2015-03-12 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-03-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jagler |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2015-02-23 | House | Introduced |