WI AB559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 48.422 (4); to amend 48.31 (2), 48.31 (4), 48.356 (1), 48.38 (5) (a), 48.38 (5m) (a), 48.415 (intro.), 48.415 (2) (a) 1., 48.415 (4) (a), 48.415 (6) (b), 48.422 (1), 48.422 (5), 48.424 (3), 48.424 (4) (intro.), 938.356 (1), 938.38 (5) (a) and 938.38 (5m) (a); and to create 48.02 (5e), 48.13 (15), 48.415 (1) (a) 4., 48.415 (1) (a) 5., 48.415 (3m) and 48.415 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: grounds for finding a child in need of protection or services or for terminating parental rights, right to a jury trial in a termination of parental rights proceeding, and permanency plan reviews. (FE)
Title
Grounds for finding a child in need of protection or services or for terminating parental rights, right to a jury trial in a termination of parental rights proceeding, and permanency plan reviews. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 37 |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative Milroy withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-17 | House | Representative Snyder added as a coauthor |
2019-12-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2019-12-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2019-11-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-30 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-24 | House | Senator Olsen added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced |