WI AB559 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 36.11 (3) (b) and 36.11 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: transfer policies for college credit earned by high school pupils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer policies for college credit earned by high school pupils.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-01-25HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2018-01-25HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2017-12-20HouseExecutive action taken
2017-12-20HouseRepresentative Vruwink added as a coauthor
2017-12-12HousePublic hearing held
2017-12-05HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
2017-10-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
2017-10-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback