WI AB559 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 32.02 (11), 32.05 (1) (a), 32.07 (2), 40.02 (28), 66.0301 (1) (a), 66.0903 (1) (d), 67.01 (5), 70.11 (2), 71.26 (1) (b), chapter 77 (title), subchapter V (title) of chapter 77 [precedes 77.70], 77.71, 77.73 (2), 77.73 (3), 77.75, 77.76 (1), 77.76 (2), 77.76 (4), 77.77 (1), 77.77 (3), 77.78, 85.063 (3) (b) 1., 85.064 (1) (b), 345.05 (2) and 611.11 (4) (a); and to create 20.566 (1) (gc), 20.835 (4) (gc), 66.1039, 77.54 (9a) (er), 77.708, 77.76 (3r), 77.76 (5) and 345.05 (1) (ag) of the statutes; relating to: authorizing the creation of regional transit authorities and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Authorizing the creation of regional transit authorities and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation |
2012-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab559 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB559.pdf |