WI AB553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 121.91 (4) (o) 1.; to amend 121.91 (4) (o) 3. and 121.91 (4) (o) 4.; and to create 115.28 (4m), 121.91 (4) (o) 1e. and 121.91 (4) (o) 1h. of the statutes; Relating to: the school district revenue limit adjustment for energy efficiency projects. (FE)
Title
The school district revenue limit adjustment for energy efficiency projects. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | House | Representative Ramthun withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee on State Affairs and referred to committee on Education pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2019-10-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab553 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB553.pdf |