WI AB553 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.75 (1) (a) 1.; and to create 16.75 (10p) and 20.931 of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for state procurement contracts and certain actions taken by state and local governmental bodies involving a boycott of Israel. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for state procurement contracts and certain actions taken by state and local governmental bodies involving a boycott of Israel. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 248 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-27-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:05 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2017-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced |