WI AB552 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 979.01 (1r); to amend 979.01 (1) (intro.) and 979.01 (1g); and to create 16.009 (2) (q), 146.82 (2) (a) 8m., chapter 156 and 979.01 (1j) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting certain individuals to make requests for medication for the purpose of ending their lives and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Permitting certain individuals to make requests for medication for the purpose of ending their lives and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab552 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB552.pdf |