WI AB552 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-19)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-19)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 447.01 (8) (a), 447.01 (8) (b), 447.01 (8) (c), 447.01 (8) (d), 447.01 (8) (e), 447.01 (8) (f), 447.01 (8) (g) and 447.01 (8) (h); to renumber and amend 447.01 (8) (intro.); to amend 447.03 (3) (h); and to create 447.01 (8) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: the definition and practice of dentistry for professional licensing purposes.
Title
The definition and practice of dentistry for professional licensing purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 341 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-21 | House | Representatives Pope, Jorgensen, Hebl, Smith, Berceau, Sinicki, Clark, Pasch, Zamarripa, Ohnstad, Wright, Goyke, Kolste, Barnes, Hesselbein, Johnson and Shankland added as coauthors |
2014-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2014-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-12-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2013-12-09 | House | Introduced |