WI AB551 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 767.41 (4) (d); to amend 767.001 (1) (k), 767.117 (1) (c), 767.215 (2) (j) 1., 767.225 (1) (bm) and 767.89 (6); to repeal and recreate 767.481; and to create 767.14, 767.41 (6) (h), 767.805 (4) (am) and 767.89 (3) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: relocating with a child who is the subject of a legal custody or physical placement order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relocating with a child who is the subject of a legal custody or physical placement order.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HousePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 203
2018-04-02HousePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-01-30HouseReport correctly enrolled on 1-30-2018
2018-01-23HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-01-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-23SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-01-23SenateRules suspended
2018-01-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-23SenateRead a second time
2018-01-19SenatePlaced on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-01-19SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-01-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-17SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-01-16SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-01-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-16HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-01-16HouseRules suspended
2018-01-16HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-16HouseRead a second time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
2017-12-19HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-12-19HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 10, Noes 0
2017-12-06HouseExecutive action taken
2017-11-16HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2017-11-15HousePublic hearing held
2017-10-19HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
2017-10-19HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback