WI AB55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 980.08 (4) (dm) 1. (intro.), 980.08 (4) (dm) 1. a., b. and c. and 980.08 (4) (dm) 4. of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 184, section 9320 (1); Relating to: applicability of 2017 Wisconsin Act 184; time frame for reports for sexually violent persons petitioning for supervised release; and placement of sexually violent persons on supervised release.
Title
Applicability of 2017 Wisconsin Act 184; time frame for reports for sexually violent persons petitioning for supervised release; and placement of sexually violent persons on supervised release.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-07-25 | House | Representative VanderMeer added as a coauthor |
2019-06-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schraa |
2019-04-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hebl |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab55 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB55.pdf |