WI AB55 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 346.22 (1) (f); to renumber and amend 343.30 (1j) and 345.60 (4); and to amend 343.30 (1), 343.31 (3) (a), 343.38 (3), 345.60 (1), 346.22 (1) (c), 346.22 (1) (d) and 346.22 (1) (e) of the statutes; relating to: vehicle failure-to-yield violations. (FE)
Title
Vehicle failure-to-yield violations. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Pridemore [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] | Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | House | Published 4-16-2012 |
2012-04-03 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 173 |
2012-03-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2012 |
2012-03-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-02-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-11-01 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-01 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-01 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-01 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-11-01 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-10-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-10-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-08-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-08-12 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Pridemore |
2011-06-21 | House | Representative Nygren added as a coauthor |
2011-04-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-05 | House | Representative Wynn added as a coauthor |
2011-03-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation |
2011-03-21 | House | Introduced |