WI AB549 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.145 (1) (a) and 601.415 (14) of the statutes; Relating to: pharmacy benefits tool grants, education and higher education funding, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Pharmacy benefits tool grants, education and higher education funding, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2021-09-10 | House | Introduced |