WI AB546 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (fr), 39.51, 59.56 (4m) and 106.34 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a student loan reimbursement program for individuals who relocate to certain rural counties, authorizing non-rural counties to create a similar student loan reimbursement program, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a student loan reimbursement program for individuals who relocate to certain rural counties, authorizing non-rural counties to create a similar student loan reimbursement program, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-02 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Education and referred to committee on Colleges and Universities pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2015-11-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-11-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab546 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB546.pdf |