WI AB545 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 946.69 (title); and to create 946.69 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: impersonating a public officer, public employee, or employee of a utility and providing a penalty.
Title
Impersonating a public officer, public employee, or employee of a utility and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-11-14 | House | Executive action taken by committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-10-31 | House | Public hearing held by committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Review Committee on Criminal Penalties |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab545 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB545.pdf |