WI AB541 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (1) (dx) and 46.248 of the statutes; Relating to: funding for Reach Out and Read Wisconsin and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for Reach Out and Read Wisconsin and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2018-01-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2017-12-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-11-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-31 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2017-10-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2017-10-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab541 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB541.pdf |