WI AB540 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 38.04 (4) (e) 8. and 343.71 (5) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver education instruction on human trafficking. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-09SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-08SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-06SenatePublic hearing held
2017-11-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 93, Noes 0
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-11-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2017-11-01HouseExecutive action taken
2017-10-26HouseRepresentative Tranel added as a coauthor
2017-10-24HousePublic hearing held
2017-10-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-10-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-10-16HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
2017-10-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback