WI AB54 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 6.86 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: limiting the times for voting by absentee ballots in person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting the times for voting by absentee ballots in person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2014-03-21SenateLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 4)
2014-02-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2014-02-07SenateReport concurrence by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 2, Noes 3
2014-02-06SenateExecutive action taken
2014-02-04SenatePublic hearing held
2014-01-31SenateSenator Grothman added as a cosponsor
2014-01-30SenatePrinted engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk
2013-11-21SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs
2013-11-15SenateReceived from Assembly
2013-11-14HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2013-11-14HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 53, Noes 39, Paired 2
2013-11-14HouseRules suspended
2013-11-14HouseOrdered to a third reading
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 39
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 6 offered by Representatives Barnes, Pasch, Johnson, Riemer, Genrich, Hesselbein, Doyle, Kahl, Shankland, Wachs, Berceau, Ringhand, Smith, Pope, Kessler, Ohnstad, Bernard Schaber, Goyke, Sargent, Billings and Kolste
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 39
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Barnes, Riemer, Kahl, Wachs, Johnson, Doyle, Clark, Hintz, Berceau, Danou, Ringhand, Smith, Hebl, Pope, Ohnstad, Bernard Schaber, Wright, Sargent, Billings and Pasch
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 39
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Hulsey
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 3 adopted
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Stroebel
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 39
2013-11-14HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Bewley, Mason, Jorgensen, Barca, Zamarripa, Smith, Ringhand, Danou and Milroy
2013-11-14HouseRead a second time
2013-11-13HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Stroebel, Bernier and Brooks
2013-11-12HouseMade a special order of business at 1:03 PM on 11-14-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2013-11-12HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2013-11-12HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2013-11-12HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 2
2013-11-12HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2013-11-12HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2013-11-12HouseExecutive action taken
2013-11-08HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stroebel
2013-10-09HousePublic hearing held
2013-03-21HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stroebel
2013-03-01HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2013-03-01HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback