WI AB536 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 134.43 (3), 968.27 (10) and 995.50 (7); and to create 968.373 and 968.375 (4) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibition on tracking the location of a cellular telephone by law enforcement without a warrant. (FE)
Title
Prohibition on tracking the location of a cellular telephone by law enforcement without a warrant. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 375 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-11-25 | House | Introduced |