WI AB534 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 16.42 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: biennial budget requests of state agencies. (FE)
Title
Biennial budget requests of state agencies. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-17 | House | Representative August added as a coauthor |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:14 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2016-01-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-11-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab534 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB534.pdf |