WI AB533 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.405 (10r) (a) 3., 20.165 (1) (g), 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 458.03 (1) (c), 458.03 (2), 458.03 (3) (a), 458.03 (3) (b), 458.085 (1), 458.085 (2), 458.085 (3), 458.095 (intro.), 458.105, 458.13, 458.21, 458.26 (2), 458.26 (3) (intro.), 458.26 (3) (i), 458.26 (4) and 458.30; and to create 15.405 (10r) (a) 1m., 440.03 (13) (b) 5s., 440.08 (2) (a) 10m., subchapter I (title) of chapter 458 [precedes 458.01], 458.01 (2m), 458.01 (3m), 458.03 (1) (dm), 458.03 (3) (c), 458.04 (3), subchapter II (title) of chapter 458 [precedes 458.055] and subchapter III of chapter 458 [precedes 458.31] of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of appraisal management companies, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulation of appraisal management companies, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Terry Katsma [R] | Rep. Leon Young [D] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Eric Genrich [D] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] |
Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-07 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-11-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-10-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen |
2017-10-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-13 | House | Representative Riemer added as a coauthor |
2017-10-13 | House | Representative R. Brooks added as a coauthor |
2017-10-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2017-10-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab533 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB533.pdf |