WI AB532 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.235 (1) (ke); to amend 20.235 (1) (b) (title), 20.235 (1) (fe), 20.235 (1) (ff), 20.235 (1) (ke), 20.235 (1) (km), 39.30 (3) (c), 39.435 (title) and 39.435 (1); and to repeal and recreate 39.30 (title) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the names, Wisconsin higher education grants, and tuition grants, to Wisconsin grants.
Title
Changing the names, Wisconsin higher education grants, and tuition grants, to Wisconsin grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 330 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-8-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2013-11-25 | House | Introduced |