WI AB529 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 111.31 (1), 111.31 (2), 111.31 (3), 111.321 and 111.345; and to create 111.32 (7g) of the statutes; Relating to: employment discrimination on the basis of family status. (FE)
Title
Employment discrimination on the basis of family status. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Labor and take up (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Labor and take up, Ayes 38, Noes 58 |
2014-01-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2013-11-25 | House | Introduced |