WI AB529 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 551.604 (2) and 551.604 (4); and to create 551.508 (1m), 551.603 (4) and 551.604 (4m) of the statutes; relating to: violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law and providing a penalty.
Title
Violations of the Wisconsin Uniform Securities Law and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Published 5-5-2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Report approved by the Governor on 4-21-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 196 | |
2010-04-20 | Presented to the Governor on 4-20-2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-24 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-24 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-23 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-04 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-04 | Read a second time | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on calendar 3-4-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-02 | Report passage recommended by committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 1 | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-27 | Read first time and referred to committee on Consumer Protection | |
2009-10-27 | Introduced |