WI AB528 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-16)
Status: Passed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Published 2-5-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-16)
Status: Passed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Published 2-5-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. a. and 119.04 (1); and to create 20.255 (2) (du) and 115.366 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to support peer-to-peer suicide prevention programs in high schools, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to support peer-to-peer suicide prevention programs in high schools, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Published 2-5-2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 83 |
2020-01-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 1-30-2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-27-2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 93, Noes 2 |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | LRB correction |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |