WI AB524 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.007 (6) (a), 799.01 (1) (d) (intro.), 799.25 (1), 812.04 (1), 812.35 (2), 814.62 (3) (a), 814.62 (3) (b), 814.62 (3) (d) 2., 814.62 (3) (e), 814.85 (1) (c), 814.86 (1) and 814.86 (1); and to create 799.01 (1m), 799.06 (4), 799.08, 799.23 and 814.62 (5) of the statutes; relating to: the jurisdictional amount and court fees in certain small claims actions.
Title
The jurisdictional amount and court fees in certain small claims actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 49, Noes 48 | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Representative Ballweg withdrawn as a coauthor | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:10 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-17 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 5 | |
2010-03-17 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 5 | |
2010-03-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 offered by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-03-16 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2010-02-05 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 7, Noes 3 | |
2010-02-05 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 7, Noes 3 | |
2010-01-12 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-08 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Hebl | |
2009-12-17 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler | |
2009-12-08 | Senator Olsen withdrawn as a cosponsor | |
2009-12-01 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-27 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Ethics | |
2009-10-27 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab524 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB524.pdf |