WI AB521 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.192 (1) (b) and 238.18 of the statutes; Relating to: grants for hiring new employees and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for hiring new employees and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining and take up (Y: 37 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-13 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining and take up, Ayes 37, Noes 60 |
2013-12-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining |
2013-11-22 | House | Introduced |