WI AB521 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 125.06 (3); to amend 125.06 (3) (title); to repeal and recreate 139.04 (1); and to create 125.02 (6m), 125.06 (3) (a) 2. and 3. and (b) and 125.06 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: homemade wine and fermented malt beverages. (FE)
Title
Homemade wine and fermented malt beverages. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs |
2012-02-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab521 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB521.pdf |