WI AB52 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 943.23 (1r); to renumber and amend 943.23 (1g); to amend 48.685 (5) (bm) 3., 48.686 (1) (c) 9., 103.34 (1) (b) 3., 165.84 (7) (ab) 1., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 301.26 (4) (cm) 1., 302.11 (1g) (a) 2., 753.061 (2m), 938.208 (1) (a), 938.34 (4h) (a), 938.34 (4m) (b) 1., 938.78 (3), 939.619 (1), 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 940.03, 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 943.23 (4m), 946.82 (4), 949.03 (2), 969.08 (10) (b), 973.0135 (1) (b) 2., 973.123 (1) and 978.13 (1) (c); and to create 939.22 (21) (qm), 941.38 (1) (b) 17m. and 943.231 (title) and (3) of the statutes; Relating to: reorganizing the crimes commonly known as “carjacking” and providing a penalty.
Title
Reorganizing the crimes commonly known as “carjacking” and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-03-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-03-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced |