WI AB52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-20-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-20-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.9875 of the statutes; Relating to: a minor contracting for admission to a shelter facility or transitional living program.
Title
A minor contracting for admission to a shelter facility or transitional living program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Published 11-20-2019 |
2019-11-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-19-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 22 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-11 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-05-15 | House | Read a second time |
2019-05-13 | House | Representative Gruszynski added as a coauthor |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-04-29 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-04-29 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-04-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2019-03-28 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-27 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |