WI AB52 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 345.35; and to amend 345.34 (1) and 345.36 (title) and (1) of the statutes; Relating to: court proceedings for traffic violations.
Title
Court proceedings for traffic violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab52 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB52.pdf |