WI AB518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 97.45 of the statutes; Relating to: labeling a food product as meat and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labeling a food product as meat and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-21SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-19HouseRepresentative Ballweg added as a coauthor
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:14 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-04HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-04HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 2
2020-01-29HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-27HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Considine, Kolste and Vruwink
2019-12-09HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spreitzer
2019-12-09HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spreitzer
2019-11-06HousePublic hearing held
2019-10-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-10-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback