WI AB516 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 108.22 (8) (b) 1. b. to d., 108.22 (8) (b) 2., 108.22 (8) (b) 3. and 108.22 (8) (bh); to renumber 108.133 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 108.22 (3); to consolidate, renumber and amend 108.22 (8) (b) 1. (intro.) and a.; to amend 20.445 (1) (aL), 20.445 (1) (u), 20.445 (1) (v), 108.02 (13) (i), 108.04 (1) (hm), 108.04 (2) (bm), 108.04 (2) (g) 2., 108.04 (7) (e), 108.04 (8) (b), 108.04 (13) (c), 108.04 (13) (e), 108.04 (16) (a) 4., 108.04 (17) (e), 108.05 (3) (d), 108.05 (10) (b), 108.062 (2) (m), 108.062 (6) (a), 108.062 (10), 108.09 (4) (d) 2., 108.09 (4) (e) 2., 108.09 (9) (c), 108.095 (8), 108.10 (1), 108.10 (5), 108.133 (2) (intro.), 108.133 (2) (a) 1., 108.133 (2) (a) 2., 108.133 (2) (a) 3., 108.133 (2) (a) 4., 108.133 (2) (a) 5., 108.133 (2) (b), 108.133 (3) (a) to (e), 108.133 (4) (a), 108.15 (3) (a), 108.15 (5) (b), 108.151 (5) (f), 108.155 (4) (intro.), 108.16 (2) (e), 108.16 (2) (em), 108.19 (1m), 108.21 (2), 108.22 (1m), 108.22 (1r), 108.22 (2), 108.22 (4), 108.22 (5), 108.22 (9), 108.223 (1) (br), 108.225 (1) (b), 108.225 (4) (b) and 815.29 (1); and to create 108.04 (1) (hr), 108.133 (1) (ag), 108.133 (4) (c), 108.16 (6) (p), 108.19 (1s) (a) 5., 108.19 (1s) (a) 6., 108.22 (1t), 108.22 (2) (c), 108.22 (3) (b), 108.22 (8) (d), 108.22 (10) and 108.22 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to the unemployment insurance law and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the unemployment insurance law and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-11-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-09-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2017-09-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab516 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB516.pdf |