WI AB514 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.185 (1), 48.357 (1) (am) 1., 48.357 (2), 48.357 (2m) (b), 938.357 (2) and 938.357 (2m) (b); to amend 46.10 (1), 46.10 (14) (b), 46.10 (14) (e) 1., 46.10 (14) (g), 48.028 (2) (e), 48.028 (2) (f), 48.185 (2), 48.235 (1) (e), 48.299 (6) (e) 5., 48.315 (2m) (a), 48.32 (1) (b) 1. (intro.), 48.32 (1) (d) 1., 48.355 (2e) (b), 48.355 (4) (a), 48.355 (4) (b) 1., 48.355 (4) (b) 2., 48.355 (4) (b) 3., 48.355 (4) (b) 4., 48.355 (4) (c), 48.357 (title), 48.357 (1) (a), 48.357 (1) (am) 2. (intro.), 48.357 (1) (am) 2m., 48.357 (1) (am) 3., 48.357 (1) (c) 1., 48.357 (1) (c) 2., 48.357 (1) (c) 2m., 48.357 (1) (c) 3., 48.357 (2m) (a), 48.357 (2m) (bm), 48.357 (2m) (br), 48.357 (2m) (c), 48.357 (2r), 48.357 (2v) (a) 1., 48.357 (2v) (a) 1m., 48.357 (2v) (a) 2., 48.357 (2v) (a) 2m., 48.357 (2v) (d) 1., 48.357 (4d) (a), 48.357 (4d) (am), 48.357 (5m), 48.357 (6) (a) (intro.), 48.357 (6) (a) 1., 48.357 (6) (a) 2., 48.357 (6) (a) 3., 48.357 (6) (a) 4., 48.357 (6) (b), 48.358 (2) (a), 48.36 (1) (a), 48.365 (5) (a), 48.365 (5) (b) 1., 48.365 (5) (b) 2., 48.365 (5) (b) 3., 48.365 (5) (b) 4., 48.38 (4m) (title), 48.75 (1g) (d), 49.345 (1), 49.345 (2), 49.345 (14) (b), 49.345 (14) (e) 1., 49.345 (14) (g), 301.12 (1), 301.12 (2), 301.12 (14) (b), 301.12 (14) (e) 1., 301.12 (14) (g), 757.69 (1) (g) 6., 757.69 (1) (g) 8., 757.69 (1) (g) 9., 757.69 (1m) (d), 767.001 (1) (i), 767.001 (1) (m), 767.59 (1), 767.59 (2) (c), 767.77 (1), 767.78 (1), 780.01 (5), 893.415 (2), 938.028 (2) (c), 938.185 (2), 938.235 (1) (e), 938.299 (6) (e) 5., 938.30 (6) (b), 938.31 (7) (b), 938.315 (2m) (a), 938.32 (1) (c) 1. (intro.), 938.32 (1) (e) 1., 938.355 (2e) (b), 938.357 (title), 938.357 (1) (title), 938.357 (1) (a), 938.357 (1) (am) (title), 938.357 (1) (am) 1., 938.357 (1) (am) 2., 938.357 (1) (am) 2m., 938.357 (1) (am) 3., 938.357 (1) (c) (title), 938.357 (1) (c) 1., 938.357 (1) (c) 2., 938.357 (1) (c) 3., 938.357 (2m) (a), 938.357 (2m) (am) (title), 938.357 (2m) (br), 938.357 (2m) (c), 938.357 (2r), 938.357 (2v) (a) 1., 938.357 (2v) (a) 2., 938.357 (2v) (a) 2m., 938.357 (2v) (c) (title), 938.357 (4d) (am), 938.357 (5m) (a), 938.357 (6) (a) (intro.), 938.357 (6) (a) 2., 938.357 (6) (b), 938.358 (2) (a), 938.36 (1) (a), 938.363 (1) (c) and 938.38 (4m) (title); and to create 48.185 (4), 48.185 (5), 48.21 (5m), 48.213 (4m), 48.217, 48.255 (1) (cg), 48.32 (1) (am), 48.355 (4g), 48.357 (1) (title), 48.357 (1) (am) (title), 48.357 (1) (c) (title), 48.357 (2) (title), 48.357 (2) (b), 48.357 (2m) (title), 48.357 (2m) (am) (title), 48.357 (2m) (b) (title), 48.357 (2v) (title), 48.357 (2v) (a) (title), 48.357 (2v) (b) (title), 48.357 (2v) (c) (title), 48.357 (2v) (d) (title), 48.357 (4d) (title), 48.357 (4d) (b) (title), 48.357 (5r) (title), 48.357 (6) (title), 48.42 (1) (bm), 48.43 (8), 48.437, 757.69 (1) (g) 15., 938.21 (5m), 938.217, 938.255 (1) (cg), 938.32 (1) (bm), 938.355 (4g), 938.357 (2) (b), 938.357 (2v) (d) (title), 938.357 (4d) (a) (title) and 938.357 (4d) (b) (title) of the statutes; Relating to: procedures for changing the placement of a child who is subject to a temporary physical custody order or termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, procedures for amending a consent decree of the juvenile court, emergency change-in-placement procedures for a child who is placed in his or her own home under a dispositional order of the juvenile court, venue in post-dispositional proceedings under the Children's Code and Juvenile Justice Code, procedures for requesting and objecting to a proposed change in placement of a child and for changing the placement of a child when no objection is filed, the appointment of a successor guardian for a child who is subject to a termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, case closure orders with respect to a child whose dispositional order is terminated, and the effective period of a temporary physical custody order of the juvenile court. (FE)
Title
Procedures for changing the placement of a child who is subject to a temporary physical custody order or termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, procedures for amending a consent decree of the juvenile court, emergency change-in-placement procedures for a child who is placed in his or her own home under a dispositional order of the juvenile court, venue in post-dispositional proceedings under the Children's Code and Juvenile Justice Code, procedures for requesting and objecting to a proposed change in placement of a child and for changing the placement of a child when no objection is filed, the appointment of a successor guardian for a child who is subject to a termination of parental rights order of the juvenile court, case closure orders with respect to a child whose dispositional order is terminated, and the effective period of a temporary physical custody order of the juvenile court. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2016-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-07 | House | Representative Johnson added as a coauthor |
2016-01-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-19 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2015-11-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2015-11-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab514 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB514.pdf |