WI AB512 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: hunting wild animals with the aid of a dog, dog training on wild animals, and dog trialing on wild animals in the northern portion of the state.
Title
Hunting wild animals with the aid of a dog, dog training on wild animals, and dog trialing on wild animals in the northern portion of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-15-2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:21 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-12-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2023-10-18 | House | Introduced |