WI AB509 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 908.07 and 970.03 (11); and to create 970.038 of the statutes; relating to: the admissibility of hearsay evidence at a preliminary examination.
Title
The admissibility of hearsay evidence at a preliminary examination.
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Mary Lazich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2012-02-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-02-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2012-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab509 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB509.pdf |