WI AB508 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 231.01 (3c), 231.01 (3m) and 231.01 (5r); to amend 66.0621 (1) (b), 231.01 (4) (a), 231.01 (4) (b) 1., 231.01 (4) (b) 2., 231.01 (4) (b) 5., 231.01 (4) (c), 231.01 (7) (a) 1., 231.01 (7) (a) 2., 231.01 (7) (a) 4., 231.01 (7) (c), 231.02 (6) (b), 231.03 (5), 231.03 (6) (b), 231.03 (6) (g), 231.03 (7), 231.03 (8), 231.03 (11), 231.03 (13), 231.03 (14), 231.03 (15), 231.03 (16), 231.03 (17), 231.03 (18), 231.03 (19), 231.04, 231.05 (1), 231.06, 231.07 (1) (b), 231.07 (2) (a), 231.08 (3), 231.08 (5), 231.10 (1), 231.12, 231.13 (1) (intro.), 231.13 (2), 231.16 (1), 231.16 (3), 231.20 and 231.23; and to create 231.01 (5) (a) 7., 231.01 (5n), 231.01 (5p), 231.01 (6m), 231.03 (6) (j) and 231.03 (6) (k) of the statutes; relating to: authorizing the Wisconsin Health and Educational Facilities Authority to issue bonds to finance projects related to nonprofit facilities. (FE)
Title
Authorizing the Wisconsin Health and Educational Facilities Authority to issue bonds to finance projects related to nonprofit facilities. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | House | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 239 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-03-27 | House | LRB correction |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 1 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2012-03-06 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 68, Noes 29 |
2012-03-06 | House | Refused to refer to committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business, Ayes 38, Noes 59 |
2012-03-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-06 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-03-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business, Ayes 7, Noes 3 |
2012-03-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2012-02-29 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business |
2012-02-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-02-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business |
2012-02-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2012-02-01 | House | Introduced |